EP0104908 - Arthropodicidal compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Division of Radiophysics, 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Division of Radiophysics, 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | ||
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION 407 Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holan, George 86 Were Street Brighton Victoria / AU | 02 /
Johnson, Wynona Marguerite Phillips 3/102 Brewer Road Bentleigh Victoria / AU | 03 /
Rihs, Kurt 33 Stanhope Street West Footscray Victoria / AU | 04 /
Walser, Reimund August 11 Mitchell Road Box Hill Victoria / AU | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305694.8 | 23.09.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | AU19820006041 | 24.09.1982 Original published format: AU 604182 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0104908 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104908 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/29, C07C43/225, C07C215/00, C07C317/00, C07C321/00, C07C49/577, A01N31/14, A01N33/10, A01N35/02, A01N41/10 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
A01N31/14 (EP);
A01N33/10 (EP);
A01N35/02 (EP);
A01N37/38 (EP);
A01N37/44 (EP);
A01N41/10 (EP);
C07C255/00 (EP);
C07C317/00 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1984/14] | C07C43/29, C07C43/225, C07C93/14, C07C147/14, C07C149/00, C07C49/577, A01N31/14, A01N33/10, A01N35/02, A01N41/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/14] | Title | German: | Arthropodizide Verbindungen | [1984/14] | English: | Arthropodicidal compounds | [1984/14] | French: | Composés arthropodicides | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.07.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.1988 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 01.12.1986 | Appeal received No. T0085/87 | 18.02.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.07.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.12.1990 | CH | 27.12.1990 | FR | 27.12.1990 | IT | 27.12.1990 | LI | 27.12.1990 | NL | 27.12.1990 | SE | 27.12.1990 | GB | 23.09.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
IT | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
SE | 27.12.1990 | ||
FR | 17.05.1991 | ||
GB | 23.09.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
IT | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
FR | 17.05.1991 | ||
GB | 23.09.1991 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
FR | 17.05.1991 | ||
GB | 23.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/01] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
FR | 17.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/45] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/43] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/39] | BE | 27.12.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2342953 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [YD]AU502950B (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG); | [YD]US4218468 (PAUL JILL H [US]); | [Y]US4206230 (PAUL JILL H [US]); | [A]FR2481695 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [E]EP0094085 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |