EP0106615 - Assay for the free portion of substances in biological fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire, HP7 9LL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire, HP7 9LL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockas, Anthony John Highmead 69, Carpenters Wood Drive Chorleywood Hertfordshire, WD3 SRP / GB | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305988.4 | 03.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | GB19820028728 | 07.10.1982 Original published format: GB 8228728 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106615 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106615 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106615 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/577 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/577 (EP);
G01N33/54306 (EP);
G01N33/686 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/17] | G01N33/54 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/17] | Title | German: | Test der freien Portion von Substanzen in biologischen Flüssigkeiten | [1984/17] | English: | Assay for the free portion of substances in biological fluids | [1984/17] | French: | Essai de la partie libre de substances dans des liquides biologiques | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0015687 (FORTIA AB [SE]); | [A]GB2030290 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB); | [A]GB2085160 (CORNING GLASS WORKS) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 25, 18th December 1978, page 430, no. 213358x, Columbus, Ohio, US | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 25, 23rd December 1974, page 390, no. 167496a, Columbus, Ohio, US |