EP0107932 - Process for increasing filling capacity of tobacco [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | ||
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Jackie Lee 4843 River Ridge Road Pfafftown North Carolina 27040 / US | 02 /
Conrad, Lucas Jones 5240 Lukon Lane Winston-Salem North Carolina 27104 / US | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305989.2 | 03.10.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | US19820432476 | 04.10.1982 Original published format: US 432476 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107932 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107932 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107932 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/28 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
A24B3/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S131/901 (EP,US);
Y10S131/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/40] |
Former [1984/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vergrösserung der Ladungsfähigkeit des Tabaks | [1984/19] | English: | Process for increasing filling capacity of tobacco | [1984/19] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter la capacité de charge du tabac | [1984/19] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3753440 (ASHBURN J); | [A]FR2179285 (REYNOLDS LEASING CORP [US]); | [A]FR2259546 (AIRCO INC [US]); | [XD]GB2018565 (PHILIP MORRIS INC); | [A]FR2447155 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]) |