EP0106677 - Tank gauging system and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILBARCO INC. 7300 West Friendly Avenue P.O. Box 22087 Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states GILBARCO INC. 7300 West Friendly Avenue P.O. Box 22087 Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haynes, John Spore 1610 Milan Drive Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Stanley, David William, et al APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Stanley, David William, et al APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1987/43] | Stanley, David William, et al APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1984/17] | Mitchell, Alan ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306208.6 | 13.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | US19820434386 | 14.10.1982 Original published format: US 434386 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106677 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106677 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106677 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/28 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G01F23/2961 (EP);
G01F23/2962 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/17] | G01G23/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/17] | Title | German: | Tankpegelmesssystem | [1990/29] | English: | Tank gauging system and methods | [1984/17] | French: | Système de jaugeage d'un réservoir et méthodes | [1984/17] |
Former [1984/17] | Tankpeilsystem und Methoden | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/47] | 30.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M14) | 19.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE878723 (ATLAS WERKE AG); | [YD]US3985030 (CHARLTON MICHAEL ROGER); | [A]US3652978 (HALLIDAY WILLIAM, et al); | [AD]US3394589 (GENICHIRO TOMIOKA); | [AD]US4229798 (ROSIE AENEAS M, et al); | [A]GB2019568 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) |