EP0137873 - Variable pitch axial flow fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMES HOWDEN & COMPANY LIMITED 195 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PJ Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states JAMES HOWDEN & COMPANY LIMITED 195 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PJ Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de la Harp, Jean H. 18 Lords Avenue Robindale Randbury Transvaal 294 / ZA | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1985/17] | Application number, filing date | 83306249.0 | 14.10.1983 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0137873 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137873 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F01D7/00, F04D29/36 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
F04D29/362 (EP,US);
F01D7/00 (EP,US);
F05D2260/74 (EP,US);
F05D2260/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/29] |
Former [1985/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Axialventilator mit verstellbaren Schaufeln | [1985/17] | English: | Variable pitch axial flow fan | [1985/17] | French: | Ventilateur axial à pales variables | [1985/17] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL | 03.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 16.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.1987
29.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Aktiengesellschaft Kühnle, Kopp & Kausch Hessheimer Strasse 2 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Klose, Hans Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Reble & Klose, Bereich Patente & Marken, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.1987
29.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Aktiengesellschaft Kühnle, Kopp & Kausch Hessheimer Strasse 2 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02.07.1987 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.07.1987 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.01.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.10.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.10.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 15.10.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 15.10.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.10.1987 | SE | 15.10.1987 | [1989/31] |
Former [1989/21] | SE | 15.10.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1088658 (DEMAG AG); | [A]FR1555814 | Opposition | DEH19283 | AT232635B |