EP0109760 - Coating process by electrodeposition and coating compositions useful in the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.12.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1991 | Opposition rejected | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1984/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlow, Alan Robert Campbell 29 Bissley Drive Cannon Lane Maidenhead Berkshire / GB | 02 /
Doroszkowski, Andrew 8 Moyleen Rise Marlow Buckinghamshire / GB | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Michael Arthur, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department : Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Kerr, Michael Arthur, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department : Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306349.8 | 19.10.1983 | [1984/22] | Priority number, date | GB19820032873 | 18.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8232873 | [1984/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109760 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109760 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109760 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
C09D5/4457 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/4434 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/4492 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/22] | C09D5/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/22] | Title | German: | Elektrophoretisches Beschichtungsverfahren und bei diesem Verfahren anwendbare Beschichtungszusammensetzungen | [1984/22] | English: | Coating process by electrodeposition and coating compositions useful in the process | [1984/22] | French: | Procédé de revêtement par électrodéposition et compositions de revêtement utilisables dans ce procédé | [1984/22] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 07.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.1989
06.03.1989
ADMISSIBLE Herberts GmbH & Co. KG Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.1989
06.03.1989
ADMISSIBLE Herberts GmbH Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 22.03.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.06.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.08.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.09.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/04] | Request for further processing for: | 16.03.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.1989 | [1990/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU436109B ; | [A]EP0015655 (ICI PLC [GB]) |