EP0112625 - Pressure regulating and balance valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1988 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1988 [1988/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT WALMSLEY LIMITED Wood Street Bury Lancashire BL8 2QT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states BELOIT WALMSLEY LIMITED Wood Street Bury Lancashire BL8 2QT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arav, Ronnie Abraham 13, Thorneyholme Close Lostock Bolton, BL6 4BZ / GB | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306563.4 | 28.10.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | GB19820030927 | 30.10.1982 Original published format: GB 8230927 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112625 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112625 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10, F15B3/00, G05D16/02 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
G05D16/10 (EP,US);
F15B3/00 (EP,US);
G05D16/02 (EP,US);
G05D16/028 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2594 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/27] | Title | German: | Druckregelungs- und Ausgleichsventile | [1984/27] | English: | Pressure regulating and balance valves | [1984/27] | French: | Valves de régulation et d'équilibrage de pression | [1984/27] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1523351 (KUESTERS EDUARD MASCHF); | [A]US3211176 (FRASER GEORGE K); | [A]DE1675541 (VATTER DIPL ING ERNST); | [A]FR2112845 (MOREL ALBERT); | [A]US3172421 (RAYFIELD HARRY F); | [A]US3905382 (WATERSTON WILLIAM); | [A]FR2219358 (BRIEU FRANCOIS [FR]) |