EP0109808 - An improved apparatus for the manufacture of photovoltaic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fournier, Eugene 28760 Cambridge Garden City Michigan 48135 / US | 02 /
Doehler, Joachim 6183 Venice Drive Union Lake Michigan 48085 / US | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306868.7 | 10.11.1983 | [1984/22] | Priority number, date | US19820441280 | 12.11.1982 Original published format: US 441280 | [1984/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109808 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109808 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109808 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/50, H01L31/18 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H01J37/3222 (EP,US);
H01L31/00 (KR);
C23C16/511 (EP,US);
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/3277 (EP,US);
H01L31/206 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1984/22] | C23C11/00, H01L31/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von photovoltaischen Anordnungen | [1984/22] | English: | An improved apparatus for the manufacture of photovoltaic devices | [1984/22] | French: | Appareil pour la production de dispositifs photovoltaiques | [1984/22] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.09.1987 | CH | 16.09.1987 | FR | 16.09.1987 | IT | 16.09.1987 | LI | 16.09.1987 | NL | 16.09.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 16.09.1987 | |
CH | 16.09.1987 | ||
FR | 16.09.1987 | ||
IT | 16.09.1987 | ||
LI | 16.09.1987 | ||
NL | 16.09.1987 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.09.1987 | |
CH | 16.09.1987 | ||
IT | 16.09.1987 | ||
LI | 16.09.1987 | ||
NL | 16.09.1987 | ||
GB | 16.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/31] | BE | 16.09.1987 | |
CH | 16.09.1987 | ||
LI | 16.09.1987 | ||
NL | 16.09.1987 | ||
GB | 16.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/24] | BE | 16.09.1987 | |
CH | 16.09.1987 | ||
LI | 16.09.1987 | ||
NL | 16.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/05] | BE | 16.09.1987 | |
NL | 16.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 16.09.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56114387 ; | [Y]EP0041773 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | [Y]US3939798 (MORTON DALE E); | [A]EP0016699 (LAMBDA TECHNICS INT [FR]); | [A]FR1570706 ; | [A]FR2330156 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]DE863522 (TELEFUNKEN GMBH); | [A]US3114652 (MCD SCHETKY LAURENCE) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 192(E-85)(864), 8th December 1981 & JP - A - 56 114 387 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 08-09-1981, & JP56114387 A 00000000 | Examination | - Jap. 7 Appl. Phys; Vol. 21, No. 8; August 1982 p.L470-L 472 |