EP0109309 - Method of operating a computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/21] | Computer system and method of operation | ||
[1990/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 2270 South 88th Street P.O. Box 98 Louisville Colorado 80027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 2270 South 88th Street P.O. Box 98 Louisville Colorado 80027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dodd, P. David 620 Poplar Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | 02 /
Blickenstaff, Ronald L. Sugarloaf Star Route Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | 03 /
Coulson, Richard L. 658 Crothers Memorial Hall Stanford University Stanford California 94305 / US | 04 /
Moreno, Robert J. 5169 Holmes Place Boulder Colorado 80303 / US | 05 /
Trede, Brian E. 1215 Delphi Drive Lafayette Colorado 80026 / US | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1984/21] | Application number, filing date | 83306969.3 | 15.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | US19820441901 | 15.11.1982 Original published format: US 441901 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109309 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109309 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109309 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/12 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
G06F12/0802 (EP,US);
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F12/0888 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G06F12/0862 (EP,US);
G06F2212/6026 (EP,US);
G06F2212/6028 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1984/21] | G11C9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1990/10] |
Former [1984/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Betriebsverfahren für eine Rechneranordnung | [1990/10] | English: | Method of operating a computer system | [1990/10] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d un système d ordinateur | [1990/10] |
Former [1984/21] | Rechneranordnung und Betriebsverfahren | ||
Former [1984/21] | Computer system and method of operation | ||
Former [1984/21] | Système d'ordinateur et procédé de fonctionnement | Examination procedure | 29.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0080876 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) | [Y] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 28, no. 22, 25th October 1980, pages 38-40, Rochelle Park, New Jersey, US; T. WILLIAMS: "Cache memory makes a hit processing I/O data quickly" | [Y] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 21, no. 3, March 1982, pages 42,47, Winchester, Massachussetts, US; "Intelligent disk/cache control unit reduces sequential file-disk response" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 3A, August 1982, page 1285, New York, US; G.C. DRISCOLL et al.: "Staging length table - a means of minimizing cache memory misses using variable length cache lines" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 3, August 1981, pages 1559-1562, New York, US; B.T. BENNETT et al.: "Improving performance of buffered DASD to which some reference are sequential" | Examination | - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol 15, No 4, Sept 1972, pp 1100-1101 |