EP0110696 - Bottom plate mechanism for a mould of a glassware container manufacturing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1988 [1988/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoth, Werner Dieter Byfanger Strasse 175 D-4300 Essen 14 / DE | 02 /
Nebelung, Hermann Heinrich Baslerstrasse 29 CH-8048 Zurich / CH | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Eric, et al c/o British United Shoe Machinery Limited P.O. Box 88 Ross Walk Belgrave Leicester LE4 5BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Atkinson, Eric, et al c/o British United Shoe Machinery Limited P.O. Box 88 Ross Walk Belgrave Leicester LE4 5BX / GB | ||
Former [1984/24] | Drury, Peter Lawrence Emhart Patents Department Lyn House 39 The Parade Oadby, Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307230.9 | 28.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | GB19820034098 | 30.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8234098 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110696 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110696 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110696 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/34, C03B9/16, C03B9/335 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
C03B9/3636 (EP,US);
C03B9/165 (EP,US);
C03B9/344 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/24] | C03B9/34, C03B9/335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1984/24] | Title | German: | Bodenplattenmechanismus für eine Form einer Glasgefässherstellungsmaschine | [1984/24] | English: | Bottom plate mechanism for a mould of a glassware container manufacturing machine | [1984/24] | French: | Mécanisme à plaque de fond pour moule de machine à fabriquer des récipients de verre | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2093016 (NORTHRUP JOHN DAVID) |