EP0112083 - Mould arrangement for use in a glassware container manufacturing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1987 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1987 [1987/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nebelung, Hermann Heinrich Baslerstrasse 29 CH-8048 Zurich / CH | 02 /
Knoth, Werner-Dieter Byfanger Strasse 175 D-4300 Essen 14 / DE | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Eric, et al c/o British United Shoe Machinery Limited P.O. Box 88 Ross Walk Belgrave Leicester LE4 5BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Atkinson, Eric, et al c/o British United Shoe Machinery Limited P.O. Box 88 Ross Walk Belgrave Leicester LE4 5BX / GB | ||
Former [1984/26] | Drury, Peter Lawrence Emhart Patents Department Lyn House 39 The Parade Oadby, Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307232.5 | 28.11.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | GB19820034406 | 02.12.1982 Original published format: GB 8234406 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112083 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112083 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112083 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/38 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
C03B9/3875 (EP,US);
C03B9/3532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1984/26] | Title | German: | Formanordnung für die Verwendung in einer Glasgefässherstellungsmaschine | [1984/26] | English: | Mould arrangement for use in a glassware container manufacturing machine | [1984/26] | French: | Agencement de moule utilisé dans une machine à fabriquer des récipients de verre | [1984/26] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 29.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3094404 (LAUCK ALBERT G); | [A]US3586491 (MENNITT JOSEPH L); | [A]FR2317237 (EMHART IND [US]) |