EP0113963 - Air flow metering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLEX (U.K.) LIMITED 77 Capitol Park Capitol Way London NW9 0EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states SOLEX (U.K.) LIMITED 77 Capitol Park Capitol Way London NW9 0EW / GB | ||
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states SOLEX (U.K.) LIMITED 77 Capitol Park Capitol Way London, NW9 0EW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagdin, Brian Colin 36 Woodland Rise Studham Dunstable Bedforshire, LU6 2PF / GB | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307276.2 | 29.11.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | GB19820035118 | 09.12.1982 Original published format: GB 8235118 | [1984/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113963 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02M69/00 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
F02M69/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/30] | Title | German: | Luftmengenmessung | [1984/30] | English: | Air flow metering | [1984/30] | French: | Mesure de débit d'air | [1984/30] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 19.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/20] | 22.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 21.05.1990 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.11.1985 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | 22.05.1990 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2163275 (BOSCH); | [A]DE2544791 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AD]DE2547635 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4197824 (HOLZBAUR SIEGFRIED [DE]) |