EP0115133 - Spiro-3-hetero-azolones for treatment of diabetic complications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipinski, Christopher Andrew 10 Connshire Drive Waterford COnnecticut / US | [1984/32] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307340.6 | 02.12.1983 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | US19820447337 | 06.12.1982 Original published format: US 447337 | US19830545450 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: US 545450 | [1984/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115133 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115133 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/02, C07D263/52, C07D277/60 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
C07D235/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/52 (EP,US);
C07D277/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/32] | Title | German: | Spiro-3-Hetero-Azolone für die Behandlung von diabetischen Schwierigkeiten | [1984/32] | English: | Spiro-3-hetero-azolones for treatment of diabetic complications | [1984/32] | French: | 3 Spiro-hétéro-azolones pour le traitement de complications diabétiques | [1984/32] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/32] | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB818724 (ICI LTD); | [A]US3532744 (FLETCHER HORACE, et al); | [A]US4181729 (BELLETIRE JOHN L [US], et al); | [A]US4226875 (SCHNUR RODNEY C); | [A]EP0017379 (PFIZER [US]) |