EP0112172 - Process for the production of dihydrocarbyl carbonates, their use as fuels additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/26] | Process for the production of dihydrocarbyl carbonates, their use as fuels additives and fuel compositions containing them | ||
[1987/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, George Ernest The British Petroleum Co. p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Fawcett, Richard Fennelly, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Fawcett, Richard Fennelly, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1984/26] | Harry, John c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307633.4 | 15.12.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | GB19820035694 | 15.12.1982 Original published format: GB 8235694 | GB19830024216 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: GB 8324216 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112172 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112172 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/00, C07C69/96 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
C07C68/00 (EP);
C10L1/19 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/00, C07C69/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dihydrocarbylcarbonaten, ihre Anwendung als Treibstoffzusätze | [1987/32] | English: | Process for the production of dihydrocarbyl carbonates, their use as fuels additives | [1987/32] | French: | Procédé de production de carbonates de dihydrocarbyle, leur utilisation comme additifs d'essence | [1987/32] |
Former [1984/26] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dihydrocarbylcarbonaten, ihre Anwendung als Treibstoffzusätze und Treibstoffmischungen die diese enthalten | ||
Former [1984/26] | Process for the production of dihydrocarbyl carbonates, their use as fuels additives and fuel compositions containing them | ||
Former [1984/26] | Procédé de production de carbonates de dihydrocarbyle, leur utilisation comme additifs d'essence et compositions d'essence les contenant | Examination procedure | 12.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 15.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0038984 (BAYER AG [DE]) |