EP0114497 - Abrasive compacts and method of making them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMOND DIVISION (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED 8th Floor 45 Main Street Johannesburg Transvaal / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMOND DIVISION (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED 8th Floor 45 Main Street Johannesburg Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dyer, Henry Brooke 28 George Street Bryanston Transvaal / ZA | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307766.2 | 20.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | ZA19820009369 | 21.12.1982 Original published format: ZA 829369 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114497 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114497 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114497 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/24, B24D3/06, B24D3/10, B22F5/00 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
B24D3/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B24D3/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/31] | B22F3/24, B24D3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Schleifpresskörper und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1984/31] | English: | Abrasive compacts and method of making them | [1984/31] | French: | Eléments abrasifs comprimés et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1984/31] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 24.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0009315 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]); | [AD]GB1598837 (GEN ELECTRIC) |