EP0114507 - Method for activating microbial rennet and further production of cheese [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/31] | Microbially produced rennet, methods for its production and reactivation, plasmids used for its production, and its use in cheesemaking | ||
[1988/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayenga, Kirk James 1910 Garden Drive Apt. 112 Burlingame California 94010 / US | 02 /
Lawlis, Virgil Bryan 1285 Alicante Drive Pacifica California 94044 / US | 03 /
Snedecor, Bradley Richard 223 Tulare Brisbane California 94005 / US | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307841.3 | 21.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | US19820452251 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: US 452251 | US19820452227 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: US 452227 | US19820452345 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: US 452345 | US19830513883 | 14.07.1983 Original published format: US 513883 | US19830513937 | 14.07.1983 Original published format: US 513937 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114507 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114507 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N9/50, C12N9/64, A23C19/032, A23C19/04 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
A23C19/0326 (EP);
C07K1/1133 (EP);
C12N1/06 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N9/52 (EP);
C12N9/6481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aktivierung von mikrobiellem Rennin und weitere Herstellung von Käse | [1988/04] | English: | Method for activating microbial rennet and further production of cheese | [1988/04] | French: | Méthode pour l'activation de la rennine d'origine microbienne et production ultérieure de fromage | [1988/04] |
Former [1984/31] | Mikrobiell hergestelltes Lab, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Reaktivierung, Plasmide, die für seine Herstellung Verwendung finden und seine Verwendung zur Herstellung von Käse | ||
Former [1984/31] | Microbially produced rennet, methods for its production and reactivation, plasmids used for its production, and its use in cheesemaking | ||
Former [1984/31] | Présure produite microbiennement, procédés pour sa production et réactivation, plasmides utilisés pour sa production, et son utilisation pour la production de fromage | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.01.1988 | NL | 27.01.1988 | SE | 31.01.1988 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.01.1988 | |
NL | 27.01.1988 | ||
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/21] | NL | 27.01.1988 | |
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/10] | NL | 27.01.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0057350 [ ]; | EP0073029 [ ]; | EP0028044 [ ]; | US4136201 [ ]; | US3661594 [ ] |