EP0120168 - Wire coil production system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION South Oyster Bay Road Bethpage, NY 11714 / US | [1984/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mihelich, Peter 42 Birch Avenue Farmingdale New York 11735 / US | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1984/40] | Fentiman, Denis Richard Elkington and Fife High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307981.7 | 23.12.1983 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | US19820454364 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: US 454364 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120168 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120168 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/04 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
B65H67/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Drahtwickel-Herstellungssystem | [1984/40] | English: | Wire coil production system | [1984/40] | French: | Système de fabrication de bobines de fil métallique | [1984/40] | File destroyed: | 06.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/28] | 23.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.10.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB958612 (OLOF HOLGER AESTROEM); | [Y]FR2165606 (DART IND INC) |