EP0084990 - Remotely controlled machine for forestry preservation or such [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guiral, Michel 40, rue du Salas F-31520 Ramonville / FR | For all designated states Cadene, Yves route de Roubis F-12240 Rieupeyroux / FR | For all designated states Alauzet, Yvon La Borie d'Hubert F-12240 Rieupeyroux / FR | For all designated states A.M.D.E.S. (association des Maires pour le développement et l'emploi en Ségala) Mairie F-12160 Baraqueville / FR | [1983/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guiral, Michel 40, rue du Salar F-31520 Ramonville / FR | [1983/31] | Application number, filing date | 83400072.1 | 12.01.1983 | [1983/31] | Priority number, date | FR19820001047 | 21.01.1982 Original published format: FR 8201047 | [1983/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084990 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084990 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/08 | [1983/31] | CPC: |
A01G3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/31] | Title | German: | Ferngesteuerte Maschine für die Pflege von Holzgewächsen oder für andere Verrichtungen | [1983/31] | English: | Remotely controlled machine for forestry preservation or such | [1983/31] | French: | Machine pour l'entretien des végétaux ligneux ou autres opérations à distance commandées | [1983/31] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/43] | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2120452 ; | [Y]GB2055284 ; | [Y]US3032956 ; | [Y]FR2127357 |