Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0087996
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
31.10.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
15.03.1988 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] |
19.03.1987 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.1987 [1987/19] |
27.08.1986 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] |
02.10.1985 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] |
31.08.1985 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] |
24.02.1984 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.1984 [1984/17] |
09.07.1983 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.09.1983 [1983/36] |