EP0090726 - Bundling strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRAND 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87045 Limoges Cédex / FR | [1984/42] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Ave du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny B.P. 523 F-87011 Limoges Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheron, Jacques Fontaine le Bourg F-76690 Cleres / FR | 02 /
Gosse, Marc St George s/Fontaine F-76690 Cleres / FR | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400600.9 | 23.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | FR19820005402 | 30.03.1982 Original published format: FR 8205402 | [1983/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090726 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D63/10 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
B65D63/1072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1983/40] | Title | German: | Verbindungsband | [1983/40] | English: | Bundling strap | [1983/40] | French: | Collier de serrage | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/02] | 18.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2448064 ; | [A]FR2278976 |