EP0093636 - Device for the detection of faults on a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaerman, Jean Fernand 2, allée des Perce-Neige F-77240 Vert St Denis / FR | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400779.1 | 20.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | FR19820007202 | 27.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8207202 | [1983/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093636 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093636 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/88 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/45] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Fehlerdetektion auf einem Werkstück | [1983/45] | English: | Device for the detection of faults on a workpiece | [1983/45] | French: | Dispositif de détection de défauts sur une pièce | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 18.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.1987
12.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Wild Leitz GmbH, Wetzlar -Konzernstelle Patente + Marken Postfach 20 20 Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 20 D-6330 Wetzlar 1 / DE | [1987/26] | 13.05.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.07.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/49] | 03.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/27] | CH | 25.06.1986 | |
LI | 25.06.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3774030 (O CONNOR D, et al); | [Y]US4284897 (SAWAMURA ICHIRO, et al); | [A]US4162405 (CHANCE BRITTON [US], et al); | [A]GB2044921 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [XP]EP0050935 (BRENT CHEMICALS INT [GB]) | Examination | EP0040995 |