blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0093062

EP0093062 - DNA containing a sequence encoding for a crystal protein or a polypeptide having insecticidal properties, microorganisms transformed with such DNA, compositions containing said crystal proteins, polypeptide or microorganisms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.03.1993 [1993/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR
28, rue du Docteur Roux
75715 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
15, Quai Anatole France
75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR
28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75715 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
15, Quai Anatole France
F-75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [1983/44]For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR
28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75715 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE
1, rue Blaise-Pascal, B.P. 296
F-67008 Strasbourg Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Klier, André
6, allée Guynemer
F-93330 Neuilly/Marne / FR
02 / Rapoport, Georges
23 Résidence des Gros Chênes
F-91370 Verrieres le Buisson / FR
03 / Dedonder, Raymond
3, allée des Pépinières
F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR
[1983/44]
Representative(s)Gutmann, Ernest, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1985/48]Gutmann, Ernest, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
F-75008 Paris / FR
Former [1983/44]Gutmann, Ernest
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date83400826.026.04.1983
[1983/44]
Priority number, dateFR1982000720126.04.1982         Original published format: FR 8207201
[1983/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0093062
Date:02.11.1983
Language:FR
[1983/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0093062
Date:11.03.1992
Language:FR
[1992/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.08.1983
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/00, C12N1/20, C12N1/16, C12R1/20, // A01N63/02, C12R1/07, C12N15/75
[1992/11]
CPC:
C12N15/75 (EP,US); A01N63/50 (EP,US); C07K14/325 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US); C12P1/04 (EP,US); C12R2001/07 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1983/44]C12N15/00, C12N1/20, C12N1/16, C12R1/20, // A01N63/02, C12R1/07
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1983/44]
TitleGerman:DNS die eine Sequenz enthalten die für ein Kristallprotein oder ein Polypeptid mit insektiziden Eigenschaften kodiert, mit solcher DNS transformierte Mikroorganismen und Zusammensetzungen die diese Kristallproteine, Polypeptide oder Mikroorganismen enthalt[1983/44]
English:DNA containing a sequence encoding for a crystal protein or a polypeptide having insecticidal properties, microorganisms transformed with such DNA, compositions containing said crystal proteins, polypeptide or microorganisms[1983/44]
French:ADN contenant une séquence codant pour une protéine du cristal ou un polypeptide doué de propriétés insecticides, micro-organismes transformés par de tels ADN, compositions contenant lesdites protéines du cristal, polypeptide ou micro-organismes[1983/44]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure28.04.1984Examination requested  [1984/28]
11.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
19.07.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.08.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.08.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1991Fee for grant paid
24.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09]
Request for further processing for:16.06.1988Request for further processing filed
25.06.1988Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.02.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
18.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
18.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 08
18.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2458585  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]);
 [XP]EP0063949  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US])
 [XD]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 78, no. 5, mai 1981, pages 2893-2897
 [YD]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA
 [Y]  - GENE, vol. 12, 1980, pages 147-154, Elsevier, North-Holland Biomedical Press, NL
 [XP]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 79, no. 19, octobre 1982, pages 6065-6069
 [XP]  - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 1, no. 7, 1982, pages 791-799, IRL Press Ltd., Oxford, GB.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.