EP0094855 - Four-wheeled vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1987 [1987/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M B K INDUSTRIE Société Nouvelle MOTOBECANE Zone Industrielle de Rouvroy F-02100 Saint Quentin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states M B K INDUSTRIE Société Nouvelle MOTOBECANE Société Anonyme française Zone Industrielle de Rouvroy F-02100 Saint Quentin / FR | ||
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states ATELIERS DE LA MOTOBECANE 16, rue Lesault F-93502 Pantin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaulmes, Christian 16, Impasse du Bureau F-75011 Paris / FR | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 64, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1983/47] | Application number, filing date | 83400840.1 | 27.04.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | FR19820008217 | 12.05.1982 Original published format: FR 8208217 | [1983/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094855 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094855 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/02, B60G21/04 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
B62D61/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/47] | B62D61/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Vierrädriges Fahrzeug | [1983/47] | English: | Four-wheeled vehicle | [1983/47] | French: | Véhicule à quatre roues | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/07] | 22.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR547268 ; | [A]US1938972 (NICHOLSON LESLIE G); | [A]DE854757 (WEIGMANN RUDOLF); | [A]FR1207435 ; | [A]FR1396383 ; | [A]US3236323 (AUSTIN LEONARD E); | [A]DE2347952 (DIE ERBEN DES STRAKATA JOSEF); | [A]FR2467133 (GRIGNARD SERGE [FR]) |