EP0094884 - Method and device for controlling the pH of the cooling water of a pressurized water nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1985/08] | For all designated states FRAMATOME ET CIE. Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saurin, Pierre 9 le Manoir de Denouval F-78750 Andresy / FR | 02 /
Trottier, Jean-Pierre 11 rue Branly F-92220 Bagneux / FR | 03 /
Nordmann, Francis 7 mail des Catalpas F-78390 Bois D'Arcy / FR | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Lavoix, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place D'Estienne D'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1985/16] |
Former [1985/05] | Bressand, Georges c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1983/47] | Bouget, Lucien CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400968.0 | 11.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | FR19820008218 | 12.05.1982 Original published format: FR 8208218 | [1983/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094884 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094884 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05D21/02, G21C19/30 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
G21C17/0225 (EP);
G21C19/04 (KR);
G05D21/02 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des pH-Wertes des Kühlwassers eines Druckwasserkernreaktors | [1983/47] | English: | Method and device for controlling the pH of the cooling water of a pressurized water nuclear reactor | [1983/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de réglage du pH de l'eau de refroidissement d'un réacteur nucléaire à eau sous pression | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1987
15.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1987
15.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 25.06.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.05.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/28] | Appeal following opposition | 01.07.1991 | Appeal received No. T0505/91 | 30.08.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.05.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1994/03] | CH | 20.08.1986 | |
LI | 20.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH376444 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2100206 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]FR2212612 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2272392 (BUDAPESTI MOSZAKI EGYETEM [HU]) |