EP0097589 - Process for removing the incondensable gases present in the heating section of an evaporator, and evaporator for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAGUILHARRE S.A. 2, avenue du 18 Juin 1940 F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [1984/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciboit, Jacques Jean 164 bis rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1984/01] | Representative(s) | Kedinger, Jean-Paul, et al CABINET MALEMONT 13 rue du Général de Castelnau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | Kedinger, Jean-Paul, et al CABINET MALEMONT 13 rue du Général de Castelnau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401251.0 | 17.06.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | FR19820010718 | 18.06.1982 Original published format: FR 8210718 | [1984/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097589 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/00, B01D1/06, B01D1/28, F28B9/10 | [1984/01] | CPC: |
F28B9/10 (EP);
B01D1/0082 (EP);
B01D1/06 (EP);
B01D1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von nicht kondensierbaren Gasen, vorhanden im Erwärmungsteil eines Verdampfers, und Verdampfer für die Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1984/01] | English: | Process for removing the incondensable gases present in the heating section of an evaporator, and evaporator for carrying out this process | [1984/01] | French: | Procédé d'évacuation des incondensables présents dans le corps de chauffe d'un évaporateur et évaporateur adapté pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1984/01] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 22.05.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2859809 ; | [Y]CH447237 ; | [A]US2760919 ; | [A]GB661863 ; | [A]US4030985 ; | [A]CH93677 ; | [A]DE2215369 |