EP0099294 - Rotor hub plates, manufacturing process and rotor craft hub embodying them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE AEROSPATIALE Société dite: 37 Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouille, René Louis Villa La Pinède Le Coton Rouge F-13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | 02 /
Leman, Jean-Luc Michel "Le Bel Ormeau" Bâtiment C3 avenue Jean-Paul Coste F-13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al ARMENGAUD JEUNE CABINET LEPEUDRY 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/46] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse Armengaud Jeune Cabinet Lepeudry 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1984/04] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse Armengaud Jeune Cabinet Lepeudry 23 boulevard de Strasbourg F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401401.1 | 07.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | FR19820011988 | 08.07.1982 Original published format: FR 8211988 | [1984/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099294 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099294 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099294 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/32 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
B64C27/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1984/04] | Title | German: | Rotorkopfplatten für Drehflügelflugzeuge und ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1984/04] | English: | Rotor hub plates, manufacturing process and rotor craft hub embodying them | [1984/04] | French: | Plateau de moyeu, procédé de fabrication et moyeu de rotor de giravion équipé de tels plateaux | [1984/04] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 09.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2156182 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [AD]FR2369158 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [AD]FR2392875 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]DE2745468 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [AD]FR2454963 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) |