EP0101357 - Automatic electronic time-division switching system, modular in traffic and capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF TELEPHONE 146, Boulevard de Valmy 92707 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF TELEPHONE 146, Boulevard de Valmy F-92707 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lecomte, Daniel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Gibaud, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1984/08] | Chaverneff, Vladimir THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401534.9 | 26.07.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | FR19820013725 | 05.08.1982 Original published format: FR 8213725 | [1984/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101357 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101357 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Automatisches elektronisches Zeitmultiplex-Vermittlungssystem, modular in Verkehrsleistung und Kapazität | [1984/08] | English: | Automatic electronic time-division switching system, modular in traffic and capacity | [1984/08] | French: | Autocommutateur électronique temporel modulaire en trafic et en capacité | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 23.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0040046 ; | [A]GB2063622 ; | [A]DE2405401 ; | [A]EP0008067 ; | [A]EP0018938 | [A] - COLLOQUE INTERNATIONAL DE COMMUTATION, 21-25 septembre 1981, Session 14A, papier 1, pages 1-9, Montréal, CA. | Examination | - COLLOQUE INTERNATIONAL DE COMMUTATION, 21-25 septembre 1981, Session 14A, papier 1, pages 1-9, Montréal, CA. M. BALLARD et al.: "Le E10S-TSS5, un système de commutation numérique polyvalent" |