EP0107521 - Process for the continuous production of lithium by electrolysis of lithium chloride in a molten salt mixture, and apparatus for carrying out said process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.10.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1989 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SPECIALITES CHIMIQUES "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosbois, Monsieur Jean 357 Parc de Cassan F-95290 l'Isle Adam / FR | 02 /
Dumousseau, Monsieur Jean-Yves 60, rue des Dames F-75017 Paris / FR | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Esson, Jean-Pierre, et al Rhône-Poulenc Interservices Service Brevets Chimie 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | Esson, Jean-Pierre, et al Rhône-Poulenc Interservices Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1987/39] | Bouvy, Aline RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/18] | Savina, Jacques RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401664.4 | 16.08.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | FR19820014865 | 31.08.1982 Original published format: FR 8214865 | [1984/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107521 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107521 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/02 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
C25C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur fortlaufenden Herstellung von Lithium durch Elektrolyse von Lithiumchlorid in einer Mischung von geschmolzenen Salzen und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1984/18] | English: | Process for the continuous production of lithium by electrolysis of lithium chloride in a molten salt mixture, and apparatus for carrying out said process | [1984/18] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation continue de lithium par électrolyse du chlorure de lithium dans un mélange de sels fondus et appareillage pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [1984/18] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 21.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
21.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | 02
29.03.1988
21.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
21.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | ||
02
29.03.1988
21.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [1988/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1988
21.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | 09.05.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.07.1989 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2075150 [ ]; | US3344049 [ ]; | US3962064 [ ] | [ ] - ELECTROCHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, vol. 1, no. 3-4, mars-avril 1963, pages 122-127 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, 1979, page 446, no. 114503a, Columbus, Ohio, US | Examination | - ELECTROCHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, vol. 1, no. 3-4, mars-avril 1963, pages 122-127. G. T. MOTOCK: "Electrolysis of lithium chloride in the 1000-amperes cell" |