EP0105783 - Coaxial multiple chamber hydraulic actuator and system provided with synchronised actuators of this type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/16] | Coaxial multiple chamber hydraulic actuator and command system provided with these synchronised actuators | ||
[1986/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1987 [1987/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouton, Pierre Charles 19, rue de la Mare aux Moines F-91350 Grigny / FR | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401841.8 | 21.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | FR19820016263 | 28.09.1982 Original published format: FR 8216263 | [1984/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105783 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105783 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14, F15B11/22, F02K1/76 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
F15B11/22 (EP,US);
F15B11/036 (EP,US);
F15B2211/2053 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30525 (EP,US);
F15B2211/324 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50518 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50536 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5151 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5153 (EP,US);
F15B2211/524 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7053 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/16] | Title | German: | Gleichachsiger hydraulischer Mehrkammerstellantrieb und System mit synchronisierten Stelleantrieben dieses Typs | [1986/45] | English: | Coaxial multiple chamber hydraulic actuator and system provided with synchronised actuators of this type | [1986/45] | French: | Vérin hydraulique à chambres multiples coaxiales et système de vérins synchronisés de ce type | [1986/45] |
Former [1984/16] | Gleichachsiger hydraulischer Mehrkammermotor und Steuersystem mit diesem Gleichlaufmotor | ||
Former [1984/16] | Coaxial multiple chamber hydraulic actuator and command system provided with these synchronised actuators | ||
Former [1984/16] | Vérin hydraulique à chambres multiples coaxiales et systèmes de commande par vérins synchronisés de ce type | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 08.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.11.1986 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   20.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2511883 [ ] (ADAMS THIERRY JOHN); | DE1157486 [ ] (PUMPENFABRIK URACH); | DE1965612 [ ] (LUC JACQUES); | DE2220180 [ ] (BIEBER GEB MAIER GISELA) | Examination | FR2433661 |