EP0105800 - Protection structure for the floor of a concrete enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casselman, Chantal Résidence Latil Place Pierre de Coubertin F-04100 Manosque / FR | 02 /
Malet, Jean-Claude 9, Allée des Acacias Les Logisssons F-13770 Venelles / FR | 03 /
Sophy, Yvon Le Petit Nice-Villa No. 11 Chemin du Four F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | 04 /
Pacton, Roger Rue de la Verdure Résidence Le Riou No. 2 F-13090 Aix en Provence / FR | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/16] | Application number, filing date | 83401904.4 | 28.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | FR19820016475 | 30.09.1982 Original published format: FR 8216475 | [1984/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105800 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105800 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G21C9/00, G21C11/08, E04B5/43 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
G21C9/016 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/16] | G21C9/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1984/16] | Title | German: | Protektionsstruktur des Bodens einer Betonhülle | [1984/16] | English: | Protection structure for the floor of a concrete enclosure | [1984/16] | French: | Structure de protection du plancher d'une enceinte de béton | [1984/16] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 04.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3288998 [ ] (PRESS JR REECE W); | FR1492900 [ ] (INDATOM S A R L SOC); | FR2226727 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | FR2300401 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | FR2321175 [ ] (INTERATOM [DE]); | FR2397590 [ ] (WANNER ISOFI ISOLATION [FR]) |