EP0136384 - Engine crankshaft pulley clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canadian Fram Limited 540 Park Avenue East P.O. Box 2014 Chatham Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states Canadian Fram Limited 540 Park Avenue East P.O. Box 2014 Chatham Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dejong, Allen W. 34 English Sideroad Chatham Ontario N7M 4417 / CA | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401933.3 | 03.10.1983 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136384 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02N17/08, F02B67/06 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
F02N19/001 (EP);
F02B67/06 (EP);
F02B2275/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/15] | Title | German: | Riemenscheibenkupplung für Motorkurbelwelle | [1985/15] | English: | Engine crankshaft pulley clutch | [1985/15] | French: | Accouplement pour poulie de vilebrequin de moteur | [1985/15] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 10.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2066972 ; | [Y]GB2069595 ; | [A]US3712766 |