|
16.05.1990 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1989 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1989 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1989 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1989 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1989 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1989 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1987 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1987 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.1985 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.06.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.1984 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1984 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Final instructions concerning extension or validation states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Refund of (partial) search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
9 |