Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE19974T | 15.06.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP83401962 | 07.10.1983 | FR8216855 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0107564 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1990 | B2 | EP0107564 | 28.05.1986 | B1 | EP0107564 | 02.05.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8216855 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3363793D1 | 03.07.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8216855 | 08.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2534163 | 09.08.1985 | B1 | FR2534163 | 13.04.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8216855 | 08.10.1982 |