EP0109332 - Arrangement for receiving radio messages consisting of biphase-type signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/21] | Method and arrangement for receiving radio messages consisting of biphase-type signals | ||
[1987/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRONIQUE SERGE DASSAULT 80, avenue Marceau F-75008 PARIS / FR | [1984/42] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states ELECTRONIQUE SERGE DASSAULT 80 Avenue Marceau F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bitsch, François 12, allée des Normandes F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402126.3 | 28.10.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | FR19820018280 | 29.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8218280 | [1984/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109332 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109332 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49, H04L7/10 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
H04L25/4904 (EP);
H04L7/046 (EP);
H04L7/033 (EP);
H04L7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL [1984/21] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Empfangen von Funksprüchen mit biphasenartigen Signalen | [1987/19] | English: | Arrangement for receiving radio messages consisting of biphase-type signals | [1987/19] | French: | Appareil pour la réception de messages radio à signaux de type biphase | [1987/19] |
Former [1984/21] | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Empfangen von Funksprüchen mit biphasenartigen Signalen | ||
Former [1984/21] | Method and arrangement for receiving radio messages consisting of biphase-type signals | ||
Former [1984/21] | Procédé et appareil pour la réception de messages radio à signaux de type biphase | Examination procedure | 06.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 03.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3806816 [ ]; | FR2281675 [ ]; | US3766315 [ ]; | WO8202985 [ ] | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF 30th ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY SOCIETY, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TRANSPORTATION ELECTRONICS, 15-17 septembre 1980, Dearborn, Michigan, IEEE cat. no. 80CH1601-4, pages 1-8(E-25), Bohn Printing Company, New York, US |