EP0110772 - Soldering and sealing process for assembling transducers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lombard, Claude 60, rue Corneille F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 02 /
Morvan, Olivier 6, Chemin de la Pelude Les Facultés - B 4 F-31400 Toulouse / FR | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet de Boisse 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/50] | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet de Boisse 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/24] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Régie Nationale des Usines RENAULT 8 et 10 Avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402246.9 | 22.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | FR19820019846 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: FR 8219846 | [1984/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110772 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110772 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/19, B23K28/00, B23K1/00, G01L9/00 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B23K28/00 (EP,US);
B23K1/00 (EP,US);
B23K1/19 (EP,US);
G01L9/0042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Löt- und Dichtungsverfahren zum Zusammensetzen von Aufnehmern | [1984/24] | English: | Soldering and sealing process for assembling transducers | [1984/24] | French: | Procédé de soudure et d'étanchéité pour la réalisation de capteurs | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4079508 [ ] (NUNN TIMOTHY A); | DE719179 [ ] (FRITZ GROHMANN) |