EP0114010 - Tank for storing liquid and liquefied gaseous fuels for an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION DES GAZ MODERNES 152, avenue des Champs Elysées F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goubert, Michel 16, Bld. Voltaire F-92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | Gorrée, Jean-Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Gorree, Jean-Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402386.3 | 09.12.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | FR19830000714 | 18.01.1983 Original published format: FR 8300714 | [1984/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114010 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114010 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114010 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/08, B60K15/04, F17C1/00 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
B60K15/03006 (EP);
B60K15/04 (EP);
F17C1/00 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/0147 (EP);
F17C2203/014 (EP);
F17C2203/0617 (EP);
F17C2205/0111 (EP);
F17C2205/013 (EP);
F17C2205/0149 (EP);
F17C2205/0305 (EP);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0352 (EP);
F17C2205/0358 (EP);
F17C2205/0382 (EP);
F17C2205/0385 (EP);
F17C2209/221 (EP);
F17C2209/234 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/045 (EP);
F17C2223/047 (EP);
F17C2250/0408 (EP);
F17C2250/0413 (EP);
F17C2260/018 (EP);
F17C2260/042 (EP);
F17C2265/066 (EP);
F17C2270/0178 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1984/30] | Title | German: | Speicherbehälter für Kraftstoff und Flüssiggas für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [1984/30] | English: | Tank for storing liquid and liquefied gaseous fuels for an internal-combustion engine | [1984/30] | French: | Réservoir pour stocker les carburants d'alimentation d'un moteur à combustion interne utilisant du carburant liquide et du carburant gazeux, notamment liquéfié | [1984/30] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 01.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3147792 [ ]; | US4370998 [ ]; | FR2462295 [ ]; | FR2350544 [ ]; | FR1121643 [ ]; | FR2507955 [ ] |