Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0145823 | Global Dossier | 15.07.1987 | B1 | EP0145823 | 26.06.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42632082 | 29.09.1982 | EP83402493 | 20.12.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1210386 | 26.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US42632082 | 29.09.1982 | EP83402493 | 20.12.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4453829 | 12.06.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US42632082 | 29.09.1982 | EP83402493 | 20.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3372441D1 | 20.08.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP83402493 | 20.12.1983 |