EP0145823 - Apparatus for mixing solids and fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
NL
DOWELL SCHLUMBERGER CORPORATION Via Espana 200 Panama 5 / PA | For:FR
COMPAGNIE DES SERVICES DOWELL SCHLUMBERGER S.A. 20, Rue Jean Jaures F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [1988/03] |
Former [1987/44] | For:DE
NL
DOWELL SCHLUMBERGER CORPORATION Via Espana 200 Panama 5 / PA | ||
For:FR
COMPAGNIE DES SERVICES DOWELL SCHLUMBERGER S.A. 20, Rue Jean Jaures F-92800 Puteaux / FR | |||
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Althouse III, James W. 3625 S. Toledo Avenue Tulsa Oklahoma / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Deptartment 26 Rue de la Cavée 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Dept. 26, rue de la Cavée F-92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1987/13] | Peuscet, Jacques SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/39] | Peuscet, Jacques Cabinet Peuscet 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/26] | Peuscet, Jacques SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402493.7 | 20.12.1983 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145823 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145823 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/14, B01F5/22, B01F7/26 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
E21B21/062 (EP,US);
B01F25/743 (EP,US);
E21B43/2607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1985/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Mischen von Feststoffen und Fluiden | [1985/26] | English: | Apparatus for mixing solids and fluids | [1985/26] | French: | Mélangeur de solides et de fluides | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 28.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5715828 ; | [A]DE897836 (KARL KRANZ INH WILHELM HEIL &); | [A]US3051454 (GOOS ARTHUR W, et al); | [A]GB1103031 (HACHIRO YAMASHITA, et al); | [A]GB1461374 (RHONE POULENC IND); | [A]DE2740789 (FUNKEN KK); | [A]DE3002720 (CONDOR ENG & MFG); | [A]EP0048312 (IVARSON NEMO) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan vol. 6, no. 78, 15 May 1982 & JP-A-57-15828, & JP5715828 A 19820515 |