EP0116804 - Toy construction kit with revolving elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1987 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dupoyet, Guy "Les Dagues" Grange l'Eveque F-10300 Sainte Savine / FR | [1984/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Karmin, Roger, et al Cabinet MONNIER, 142-150, Cours Lafayette, B.P. 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1984/35] | Application number, filing date | 83420025.5 | 17.02.1983 | [1984/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116804 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/10 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
A63H33/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1984/35] | Title | German: | Spielbausatz mit rotierenden Bauelementen | [1984/35] | English: | Toy construction kit with revolving elements | [1984/35] | French: | Jeu de construction à modules roulants | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 06.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 30.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/48] | 05.07.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1986 | 02.03.1987 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR670548 ; | [A]FR1160703 ; | [A]GB191505810 |