EP0099841 - Process for the preparation of beta, gamma insaturated carboxylic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE DE BASE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE DE BASE 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenck, Jean 4, avenue de la Paix F-68490 Chalampe / FR | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Varnière-Grange, Monique, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | [1984/05] | Application number, filing date | 83420116.2 | 07.07.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | FR19820012231 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: FR 8212231 | [1984/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099841 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099841 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/14, C07C57/03, C07C67/38 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
C07C51/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/14, C07C57/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung Beta,Gamma-ungesättigter Carbonsäuren | [1984/05] | English: | Process for the preparation of beta, gamma insaturated carboxylic acids | [1984/05] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'acides carboxyliques bêta, gamma-insaturés | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 27.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP79112814 ; | [Y]DE805641 (BASF AG); | [Y]FR2274595 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | [A]FR2291962 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [E]FR2498594 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 3, 21 janvier 1980, page 646, no. 22078h, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 79 112 814 (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) 04-09-1979, & JP79112814 A 00000000 |