EP0108024 - Floating and filtering anti-pollution barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAT Taraflex, Société Anonyme dite : Boulevard Garibaldi F-69170 Tarare / FR | [1984/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viel, Maurice Parc Chalin Bâtiment Debussy 137 Chemin Louis Chirpaz F-69130 Ecully / FR | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [1984/19] | Application number, filing date | 83420163.4 | 13.10.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | FR19820018373 | 28.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8218373 | [1984/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108024 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108024 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E02B15/04 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
E02B15/06 (EP);
Y02A20/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, NL [1984/19] | Title | German: | Schwimmende und filtrierende Barriere für Verunreinigungen | [1984/19] | English: | Floating and filtering anti-pollution barrier | [1984/19] | French: | Barrage flottant filtrant anti-pollution | [1984/19] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 25.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.12.1985 | NL | 27.12.1985 | [1999/42] |
Former [1988/23] | NL | 27.12.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US3702657 [ ] (CUNNINGHAM GERALD ROBERT, et al); | US4111813 [ ] (PREUS PAUL); | FR2163836 [ ] (REBUT PAUL); | FR2101764 [ ] (JOHNS MANVILLE) |