EP0099317 - Device for lifting the lower borders of coverings from tunnel greenhouses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fimbault, Jean-Pierre "La Sautonie" Saint-Hilaire-d'Estissac F-24140 Villamblard / FR | [1984/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Chambon, Georges Cabinet Chambon 6 et 8 avenue Salvador Allende F-93804 Epinay S/Seine Cédex / FR | [1986/03] |
Former [1984/45] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/04] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 83450018.3 | 08.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | FR19820012225 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: FR 8212225 | [1984/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099317 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099317 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/24 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
A01G9/242 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Hochheben der unteren Ränder der Abdeckungen von Tunnel-Gewächshäusern | [1984/04] | English: | Device for lifting the lower borders of coverings from tunnel greenhouses | [1984/04] | French: | Dispositif de relevage des bords inférieurs des éléments de recouvrement des serres-tunnels | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 28.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/35] | 24.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2738241 (RUP REINHARD); | [A]FR2359264 (BRUYANT CYRILLE [FR]) |