EP0088718 - Thickener on the basis of polyether derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Patente GmbH Postfach 10 01 49 Kasinostrasse 19-23 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states Akzo Patente GmbH Postfach 10 01 49 Kasinostrasse 19-23 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | ||
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states Akzo GmbH Postfach 10 01 49 Kasinostrasse 19-23 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seibert, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Am Hinzenbusch 62 D-5160 Düren-Niederau / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Klaus Appolinarisstrasse 71 D-5166 Kreuzau-Obermaubach / DE | 03 /
Spiess, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Schulstrasse 20 D-5042 Erftstadt-Gymnich / DE | 04 /
Bruil, Hendrik G., Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Irenelaan 41 NL-6713 Ede/Niederlande / NL | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1987/26] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 83710004.9 | 18.02.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | DE19823207613 | 03.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3207613 | DE19833302465 | 26.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3302465 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088718 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088718 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088718 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/28, C08G65/06, C08G65/32, C11D3/37, B01F17/00, C09K3/20 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
C08G65/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/3707 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/11] | C08G65/28, C11D3/37, C09K3/20, B01F17/00, B01F17/00, C09K3/20 | ||
Former IPC [1983/37] | C08G65/32, C11D3/37, C09K3/20, B01F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Verdickungsmittel auf der Basis Polyätherderivate | [1983/37] | English: | Thickener on the basis of polyether derivatives | [1983/37] | French: | Moyen d'épaississement à base de dérivés de polyéther | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0018482 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0024472 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]US4312775 (PANEK EDWARD J, et al) | Examination | US4288639 |