EP0095438 - Construction set for a microoptical bench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spindler & Hoyer GmbH & Co. Königsallee 23 D-37081 Göttingen / DE | [1983/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingner, Hartmut, Ing.-grad. An der Tränke 12 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Bibrach Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Rehberg Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83710028.8 | 18.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | DE19823219399 | 24.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3219399 | [1983/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095438 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095438 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/04 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
G01M11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/48] | Title | German: | Bausatz zum Aufbau einer mikrooptischen Bank | [1983/48] | English: | Construction set for a microoptical bench | [1983/48] | French: | Groupe d'éléments de construction pour la construction d'un banc microoptique | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2636657 (SPINDLER & HOYER KG); | [AD]CH465328 (SCHEER & CIE C F [DE]); | [A]DE2308093 (BREMSHEY AG); | [A]CH340675 (W J STOKVIS KONINKL FABRIEK VA [NL]) |