EP0097620 - Heat or pressure sensitive registration material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1987 [1987/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Rosalinde, Dr. Im Niederholzboden 46 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1984/01] | Application number, filing date | 83810270.5 | 20.06.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | CH19820003886 | 24.06.1982 Original published format: CH 388682 | CH19830000318 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: CH 31883 | [1984/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097620 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097620 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097620 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/12, B41M5/26 | [1984/01] | CPC: |
B41M5/155 (EP,US);
B41M5/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/01] | Title | German: | Druckempfindliches oder wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1984/01] | English: | Heat or pressure sensitive registration material | [1984/01] | French: | Matériel d'enregistrement sensible à la chaleur ou à la pression | [1984/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1983 | Examination requested [1984/01] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1926421 [ ] (NASHUA CORP); | DE2161202 [ ] (RICOH KK); | US3980492 [ ] (THOMPSON THOMAS D); | EP0012112 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | US4226962 [ ] (STOLFO JOHN J) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 189(M-99)(861), 28. November 1981, Seite 112 M 99; |