EP0106795 - Sewing machine accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRITZ GEGAUF AG BERNINA-NÄHMASCHINENFABRIK Seestrasse 8266 Steckborn / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states FRITZ GEGAUF AG BERNINA-NÄHMASCHINENFABRIK Seestrasse CH-8266 Steckborn / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreier, Ernst Mühlhofstrasse 27 D-8266 Steckborn / CH | 02 /
Rickenbach, Jakob Zielstrasse 6 D-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Algisserstrasse 33 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Algisserstrasse 33 CH-8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810343.0 | 29.07.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | CH19820005453 | 15.09.1982 Original published format: CH 545382 | [1984/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106795 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106795 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D05B37/04 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
D05B37/063 (EP,US);
D05B37/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/17] | Title | German: | Zusatzvorrichtung für Nähmaschine | [1984/17] | English: | Sewing machine accessory | [1984/17] | French: | Accessoire pour machine à coudre | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 04.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1997617 [ ] (WEIS ALBERT H); | US2021700 [ ] (BARNET PUGACH); | DE1003553 [ ] (OSVALD MADSEN); | US3149590 [ ] (FOWLER SR GILBERT); | CH541650 [ ] (MARBACHER STEPHAN [CH]) |