EP0136389 - Warp let-off control mechanism for looms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK SULZER-RÜTI AG CH-8630 Rüti (Zürich) / CH | [1985/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bucher, Robert Bergstrasse CH-5262 Frick / CH | 02 /
Küng, Walter Guldistudweg 16 CH-8630 Tann-Dürnten / CH | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Gubler, Hans Gebrüder Sulzer AG KSR/Patente CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [1986/18] |
Former [1985/15] | Wall, Erich, Dr. Gebrüder Sulzer AG KSR/Patente CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810441.2 | 03.10.1983 | [1985/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136389 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136389 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D03D43/10 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
D03D49/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/15] | D03D49/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/28] |
Former [1985/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kettablass-Steuereinrichtung für Webmaschinen | [1985/15] | English: | Warp let-off control mechanism for looms | [1985/15] | French: | Mécanisme de contrôle du déroulement de fils de chaîne pour métier à tisser | [1985/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1983 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 21.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, LU, NL, SE | 01.04.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.10.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH629549 (GROB WILLY AG [CH]); | [AD]CH631756 (VYZK VYVOJOVY USTAV VSEOBE [CS]); | [AD]DE1138715 (SULZER AG); | [A]FR2423570 (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) |