EP0107620 - Phenol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenk, Paul, Dr. Quellenweg 7 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
Breitenstein, Werner, Dr. St. Galler-Ring 179 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 03 /
Baumann, Marcus, Dr. Hammerstrasse 82 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [1984/18] | Application number, filing date | 83810462.8 | 07.10.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | CH19820005987 | 13.10.1982 Original published format: CH 598782 | [1984/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107620 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C91/44, C07C93/26, C07C95/08, C07D207/325, C07D295/08, C07D295/10, A61K31/135, A61K31/22, A61K31/395 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
C07D207/325 (EP);
C07D295/06 (KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C45/46 (EP);
C07C59/76 (EP);
C07D295/096 (EP);
C07D295/112 (EP);
C07D295/155 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/46, C07C49/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/18] | Title | German: | Phenol-Derivate | [1984/18] | English: | Phenol derivatives | [1984/18] | French: | Dérivés de phénols | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 15.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/37] | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2007554 [ ] (GEIGY AG J R, et al); | US3855291 [ ] (ARCHER S, et al); | EP0082109 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |