EP0106806 - Method to manufacture an exterior part of a time piece, and part obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ratajski, Michel rue Scholl 35 CH-2504 Bienne / CH | [1984/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard SA Ingénieurs-Conseils ACP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard SA Ingénieurs-Conseils ACP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810467.7 | 10.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | CH19820005949 | 11.10.1982 Original published format: CH 594982 | CH19830002284 | 28.04.1983 Original published format: CH 228483 | [1984/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106806 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G04D3/00, G04B19/12, G04B37/22, G04B39/00 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
G04B37/22 (EP);
G04B19/12 (EP);
G04B39/02 (EP);
G04D3/0069 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines äusseren Uhrenteiles und durch dieses Verfahren hergestelltes Teil | [1984/17] | English: | Method to manufacture an exterior part of a time piece, and part obtained thereby | [1984/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un composant de l'habillement d'un garde-temps et composant obtenu selon ce procédé | [1984/17] | File destroyed: | 03.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 25.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/25] | 08.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH332904 [ ]; | CH378787 [ ]; | CH530472 [ ]; | US3228861 [ ]; | DE1621034 [ ] | [ ] - DIE UHR, vol. 19, no. 17, 5 septembre 1965, pages 131-136 |