EP0108040 - Method for the automatic winding of an annular ferromagnetic body, winding machine for the application of this method and wound stator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K + S Schrittmotoren GmbH Mühlenstrasse 4 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | [1985/04] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states SCHRIMO AG CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hetzel, Max Jurastrasse 563 CH-4707 Deitingen / CH | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Steiner, Martin, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | Steiner, Martin, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810472.7 | 12.10.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | CH19820006152 | 22.10.1982 Original published format: CH 615282 | [1984/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108040 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108040 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/085, H02K3/50, H02K3/28 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
H02K15/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum automatischen Bewickeln eines ringförmigen ferromagnetischen Körpers, Wickelmaschine zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens und bewickelter Stator | [1984/19] | English: | Method for the automatic winding of an annular ferromagnetic body, winding machine for the application of this method and wound stator | [1984/19] | French: | Méthode pour le bobinage automatique d'un corps ferromagnétique annulaire, machine à bobiner pour l'application de cette méthode et stator bobiné | [1984/19] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 01.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2624518 [ ] (SCOFIELD ROBERT O, et al); | FR1134892 [ ] (ELECTROMECANIQUE JAPY SOC); | US3220094 [ ] (ROBERTS GEORGE I); | US3334825 [ ] (FRIEDRICH BRUNO R); | DE2348641 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | FR2355396 [ ] (ITW FASTEX ITALIA SPA [IT]); | US4170505 [ ] (ZGRAGGEN MARTIN A [US]) |